Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:20:10 (UTC).

SHIVLEY, EMMYLOU, SHIVLEY, GWEN M Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 SHIVLEY, EMMYLOU, SHIVLEY, GWEN M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

SHIVLEY, GWEN M

Not Classified By Court

SHIVLEY, EMMYLOU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BUCK, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $6.00 Receipt Number H 727186

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH GWEN MARIE SHIVLEY (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST SIGNED BY DEPUTY CLERK EMAILED TO ATTY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST SIGNED BY DEPUTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY INITIAL TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 723368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000280CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001227CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN