This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/22/2020 at 13:21:56 (UTC).

SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC VS SPEARS, EAKEISA

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SPEARS, EAKEISA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC

Defendant

SPEARS, EAKEISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL GEORGE F

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL STIP EXPRIATION (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION)

05/06/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL STIP EXPRIATION (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION)

ORDER FILED APPROVING STIP OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE DTD 111720

11/17/2020:ORDER FILED APPROVING STIP OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CASE DTD 111720

CHECK REQUISITION FORM - RECEIPT 700941 DATED 100120 $894.00 PLUS INT PAYABLE TO SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS GENERAL PARTNER OF SHA ASSOCIATES II LTD A LIMITED PARTHERSHIP

11/25/2020:CHECK REQUISITION FORM - RECEIPT 700941 DATED 100120 $894.00 PLUS INT PAYABLE TO SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS GENERAL PARTNER OF SHA ASSOCIATES II LTD A LIMITED PARTHERSHIP

MOTION FILED TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEFPOSIT - STIPULATION SIGNED FILED BY PLNTF

11/09/2020:MOTION FILED TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEFPOSIT - STIPULATION SIGNED FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLNTF DTD 111620

11/18/2020:ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLNTF DTD 111620

SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

12/08/2020:SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

STIPULATION FILED AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

11/09/2020:STIPULATION FILED AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

COURT WORKSHEET - STIP FILED

11/10/2020:COURT WORKSHEET - STIP FILED

MOTION FILED FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FILED BY PLNTF

11/09/2020:MOTION FILED FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE EVICTION HEARING ON 111020 AT 12:00 VIA ZOOM

10/20/2020:NOTICE EVICTION HEARING ON 111020 AT 12:00 VIA ZOOM

MOTION FILED TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IF JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ENTERED FILED BY PLNTF

10/07/2020:MOTION FILED TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IF JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ENTERED FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - POSSESSION ONLY FILED BY PLNTF

10/07/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - POSSESSION ONLY FILED BY PLNTF

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS WAS MAILED TO DEFENDANT ON 092520

09/25/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS WAS MAILED TO DEFENDANT ON 092520

ANSWER FILED BY DFDNT EAKEISA SPEARS

09/25/2020:ANSWER FILED BY DFDNT EAKEISA SPEARS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: EAKEISA SPEARS

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: EAKEISA SPEARS

SUMMONS ISSUED EAKEISA SPEARS - BLANK

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED EAKEISA SPEARS - BLANK

COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

09/22/2020:COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

COVER SHEET

09/22/2020:COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE EVICTION HEARING ON 111020 AT 12:00 VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IF JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ENTERED FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - POSSESSION ONLY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON EAKEISA SPEARS 092420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $915.00 Receipt Number H 700941

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $915.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $915.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS WAS MAILED TO DEFENDANT ON 092520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DFDNT EAKEISA SPEARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: EAKEISA SPEARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EAKEISA SPEARS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number H 699748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CC000815CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHA ASSOCIATES II GP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS