Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/09/2021 at 10:21:54 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC VS FLEISCHER, IAN

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLEISCHER, IAN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC

Defendant

FLEISCHER, IAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: IAN FLEISCHER - PTC ON 060321 AT 1145AM CRTRM C

04/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: IAN FLEISCHER - PTC ON 060321 AT 1145AM CRTRM C

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $6064.70

03/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $6064.70

COVER SHEET

03/31/2021:COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/31/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO IAN FLEISCHER (BLANK)

03/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO IAN FLEISCHER (BLANK)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: IAN FLEISCHER - PTC ON 060321 AT 1145AM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 729520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $6064.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO IAN FLEISCHER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000742SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant