This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 19:55:53 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE VS HASKINS, JANE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HASKINS, JANE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE

Defendant

HASKINS, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JANE HASKINS (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING MICHAEL HASKINS, HUSBAND) AT 021619

02/19/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JANE HASKINS (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING MICHAEL HASKINS, HUSBAND) AT 021619

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: JANE HASKINS - PT 031319 AT 10:45AM IN CRTROOM B

01/29/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: JANE HASKINS - PT 031319 AT 10:45AM IN CRTROOM B

SUMMONS ISSUED JANE HASKINS (BLANK)

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JANE HASKINS (BLANK)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

01/22/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1757.57

01/22/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1757.57

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JANE HASKINS (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING MICHAEL HASKINS, HUSBAND) AT 021619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: JANE HASKINS - PT 031319 AT 10:45AM IN CRTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 607123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JANE HASKINS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1757.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case 272019SC000229SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less