Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:10:40 (UTC).

SCHOENEWALD, WENDY WEBB, WEBB, LEO J Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 SCHOENEWALD, WENDY WEBB, WEBB, LEO J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SCHOENEWALD, WENDY WEBB

Decedent

WEBB, LEO J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

GERLING, DANA LAGANELLA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $15.50 Receipt Number H 726292

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $15.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $15.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH MARYANN H WEBB (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH MARYANN H WEBB (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT WENDY WEBB SCHOENEWALD

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000283CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH LEO JAMES WEBB (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF LEO J WEBB (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000253CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERLING, DANA