This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/26/2022 at 18:21:32 (UTC).

SALAZAR, JOHN VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 SALAZAR, JOHN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD E, ANGELIADIS, GEORGE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR, JOHN

Defendants

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS

MCMORROW HERNANDEZ, KELLY MICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OTTAVIANO, NICHOLAS LOUIS

SHELTON, ADAM CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

LITTLEJOHN, MARY CARMEN

PERROTT, DAVID ALAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/19/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

MAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

04/12/2021:MAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING 040521 @ 2:00PM

04/01/2021:NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING 040521 @ 2:00PM

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLNTF ON 031721 FILED BY DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

03/17/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLNTF ON 031721 FILED BY DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

03/17/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF - MEDIATION APPEARANCE - MARCH 17, 2021 @ 9:00 AM PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-CLAIM DEFENDANT, JOHN SALAZAR WILL APPEAR AT THE MEDIATION CONFERENCE AND MICHAEL BUCHANAN AS REP FOR ALLSTATE INS

03/16/2021:NOTICE OF - MEDIATION APPEARANCE - MARCH 17, 2021 @ 9:00 AM PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-CLAIM DEFENDANT, JOHN SALAZAR WILL APPEAR AT THE MEDIATION CONFERENCE AND MICHAEL BUCHANAN AS REP FOR ALLSTATE INS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO COUNTER-CLAIM PLNTF, KELLY MICHELLE MCMORROW-HERNANDEZ FILED BY COUNTER-CLAIM DEF JOHN SALAZAR

03/16/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO COUNTER-CLAIM PLNTF, KELLY MICHELLE MCMORROW-HERNANDEZ FILED BY COUNTER-CLAIM DEF JOHN SALAZAR

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

03/10/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLNTF PURSUANT TO NTC OF PROD DATED 102020 FILED BY DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

03/08/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLNTF PURSUANT TO NTC OF PROD DATED 102020 FILED BY DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADAM C SHELTON ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR PLNTF AND EMAIL DESIG service-ashelton@sheltonmckean.com (AMENDED)

01/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADAM C SHELTON ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR PLNTF AND EMAIL DESIG service-ashelton@sheltonmckean.com (AMENDED)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO COUNTER-CLAIM PLNTF, KELLY MICHELLE MCMORROW-HERNANDEZ FILED BY COUNTER-CLAIM DEF, JOHN SALAZAR

01/15/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO COUNTER-CLAIM PLNTF, KELLY MICHELLE MCMORROW-HERNANDEZ FILED BY COUNTER-CLAIM DEF, JOHN SALAZAR

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY COUNTER-DEF, JOHN SALAZAR

01/15/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY COUNTER-DEF, JOHN SALAZAR

COURT WORKSHEET -

12/30/2020:COURT WORKSHEET -

ORDER FILED SCHE CAUSE FOR PTC ON 1108021 AT 9:30 AND JURY TRIAL TO COMMENCE DURING THE 2 WEEK TRIAL TERM BEGINNING 120621 AT 8:30 DTD 121820

12/28/2020:ORDER FILED SCHE CAUSE FOR PTC ON 1108021 AT 9:30 AND JURY TRIAL TO COMMENCE DURING THE 2 WEEK TRIAL TERM BEGINNING 120621 AT 8:30 DTD 121820

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 031721 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR JEFFREY A CAGLIANONE ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

12/04/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 031721 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR JEFFREY A CAGLIANONE ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

DOCUMENTS FILED - COURTCALL APPEARANCE CALENDAR

12/02/2020:DOCUMENTS FILED - COURTCALL APPEARANCE CALENDAR

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

11/30/2020:CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

11/20/2020:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING 040521 @ 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLNTF ON 031721 FILED BY DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - MEDIATION APPEARANCE - MARCH 17, 2021 @ 9:00 AM PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-CLAIM DEFENDANT, JOHN SALAZAR WILL APPEAR AT THE MEDIATION CONFERENCE AND MICHAEL BUCHANAN AS REP FOR ALLSTATE INS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO COUNTER-CLAIM PLNTF, KELLY MICHELLE MCMORROW-HERNANDEZ FILED BY COUNTER-CLAIM DEF JOHN SALAZAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLNTF PURSUANT TO NTC OF PROD DATED 102020 FILED BY DEF, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, KELLY MICHELL MCMORRW- HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MICHELLE MCMORROW - HERNANDEZ ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000441CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS L OTTAVIANO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHELTON ADAM C