This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/20/2019 at 16:17:35 (UTC).

S RODRIGUEZ PR OF THE ESTATE O VS CARR, RODGER JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 S RODRIGUEZ PR OF THE ESTATE O filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARR, RODGER JAMES. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S RODRIGUEZ PR OF THE ESTATE O

Defendants

CARR, RODGER JAMES

CARR, SHANNON RAE

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO GE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIPS, CHARLES SHELTON

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RODGER JAMES CARR

12/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RODGER JAMES CARR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHANNON RAE CARR

12/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHANNON RAE CARR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO (GEICO)

12/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO (GEICO)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RODGER JAMES CARR (BLANK)

12/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RODGER JAMES CARR (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHANNON RAE CARR (BLANK)

12/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHANNON RAE CARR (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO (GEICO) (BLANK)

12/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO (GEICO) (BLANK)

EXHIBITS - DECLARATIONS PAGE

11/27/2019:EXHIBITS - DECLARATIONS PAGE

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

11/27/2019:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

EXHIBITS - AFFIDAVIT

11/27/2019:EXHIBITS - AFFIDAVIT

COVER SHEET

11/27/2019:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RODGER JAMES CARR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHANNON RAE CARR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO (GEICO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number H 659546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 659501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RODGER JAMES CARR (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHANNON RAE CARR (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 658392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS - AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS - DECLARATIONS PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001357CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant