Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 12:02:43 (UTC).

RUSSONIELLO, ANN MARIE, VENNERA, FERDINAND P Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 RUSSONIELLO, ANN MARIE, VENNERA, FERDINAND P was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

RUSSONIELLO, ANN MARIE

Decedent

VENNERA, FERDINAND P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DAY, SANDRA H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 05/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 05/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF FERDINAND VENNERA (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 679496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH FERDINAND PETER VENNERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY FERDINAND VENNERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000420CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, SANDRA H.