This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 09/25/2021 at 21:08:26 (UTC).

RUSCONI, ROSEMARY

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 RUSCONI, ROSEMARY was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

RUSCONI, ROSEMARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $41.00 Receipt Number H 752870

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $41.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP001120CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD