This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 19:38:30 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, JOHN P VS ORTIZ, INES M

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 RODRIGUEZ, JOHN P filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ORTIZ, INES M. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBEE, DON JR and DON BARBEE JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARBEE, DON JR

DON BARBEE JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ, JOHN P

Respondent

ORTIZ, INES M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD 9/30/20 INES M ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD ON INES M ORTIZ ON 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION GRANTED FOR 1 YEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT - DOM VIOLENCE UNTIL 9/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S LETTER TO HERNANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGIANST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITIIONERS WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 9/30/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR001670DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less