Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/18/2021 at 13:18:52 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 RODRIGUEZ, JOHN was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT, HITZEMANN, KURT E and HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANIMAL ENFORCEMENT UNIT

HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFIC

HERNANDO COUNTY

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOUBEN, JON AARON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/01/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION FILED TO HAVE CASE RESCHEDULED FILED BY DFDNT JOHN RODRIGUEZ

02/24/2021:MOTION FILED TO HAVE CASE RESCHEDULED FILED BY DFDNT JOHN RODRIGUEZ

COURT WORKSHEET - PETITION GRANTED - TO BE PROVIDED BY AGENCY AND SIGNED BY JUDGE

02/24/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - PETITION GRANTED - TO BE PROVIDED BY AGENCY AND SIGNED BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JON A JOUBEN ESQ ON BEHALF OF HERNANDO COUNTY AND EMAIL DESIG jjouben@co.hernando.fl.us

02/16/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JON A JOUBEN ESQ ON BEHALF OF HERNANDO COUNTY AND EMAIL DESIG jjouben@co.hernando.fl.us

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD PETITION TO DETERMINE ANIMAL OWNER FITNESS ON JOHN RODRIGUEZ 021821

02/22/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD PETITION TO DETERMINE ANIMAL OWNER FITNESS ON JOHN RODRIGUEZ 021821

PETITION TO DETERMINE ANIMAL OWNER FITNESS, HRG 02/24/21 @ 11:00AM, CRTRM C

02/16/2021:PETITION TO DETERMINE ANIMAL OWNER FITNESS, HRG 02/24/21 @ 11:00AM, CRTRM C

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO HAVE CASE RESCHEDULED FILED BY DFDNT JOHN RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - PETITION GRANTED - TO BE PROVIDED BY AGENCY AND SIGNED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD PETITION TO DETERMINE ANIMAL OWNER FITNESS ON JOHN RODRIGUEZ 021821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: HEALIS , KRISTIE MARIE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: HEALIS , KRISTIE MARIE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JON A JOUBEN ESQ ON BEHALF OF HERNANDO COUNTY AND EMAIL DESIG jjouben@co.hernando.fl.us

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE ANIMAL OWNER FITNESS, HRG 02/24/21 @ 11:00AM, CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CC000191CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDON COUNTY A POLITICAL S is a litigant

Latest cases where ANIMAL ENFORCEMENT UNIT is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFIC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOUBEN, JON AARON