Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 16:26:05 (UTC).

RILEY, JOSEPH G, RILEY, TERENCE J Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 RILEY, JOSEPH G, RILEY, TERENCE J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RILEY, TERENCE J

Decedent

RILEY, JOSEPH G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAY, SANDRA H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (AMENDED) DTD 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 05/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 05/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JOSEPH G RILEY (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 677176

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH JOSEPH GERARD RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY JOSEPH G. RILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000362CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, SANDRA H.