Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 19:35:56 (UTC).

RICE, TYLER VS MCVEY, ASHLEIGH

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 RICE, TYLER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MCVEY, ASHLEIGH. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICE, TYLER

Respondent

MCVEY, ASHLEIGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorney

ATHANASON, MILLICENT B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE KAREN OZYJOWSKI OBO ASHLEIGH MCVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ASHLEIGH MCVEY ON 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ASHLEIGH MCVEY SIGNED AND SEALED BY CLERK 3/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES WITH ATTACHMENTS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 728781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000612DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATHANASON , MILLICENT B