This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 07:08:32 (UTC).

RENCZKOWSKI, ALEXANDER VS RENCZKOWSKI, ASHLEE BELLE

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 RENCZKOWSKI, ALEXANDER filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against RENCZKOWSKI, ASHLEE BELLE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RENCZKOWSKI, ALEXANDER

Respondent

RENCZKOWSKI, ASHLEE BELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT-NAME CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED SETTING ELECTRONIC HEARING ZOOM 11/19*/21 AT 4:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCompliance MISC has been created with due date of 4/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR REFERRAL TO GEN MAG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AGREEMENT AND PRIVACY ACT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 759751

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR001943DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less