This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/31/2021 at 07:47:25 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERG VS NOTARO, KRIS N Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/01/2015 REGIONS BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NOTARO, KRIS N. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERG

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

NOTARO, KRIS N

NOTARO, RICHARD V JR

Not Classified By Court

LUDWIG, KRIS N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEUMAN, ROD BARRETT

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

08/11/2015:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS WITHOUT PREJUDICE *

08/11/2015:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS WITHOUT PREJUDICE *

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2

03/12/2015:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON KRIS N. NOTARO FKA KRIS N. LUDWIG ON 022215

03/12/2015:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON KRIS N. NOTARO FKA KRIS N. LUDWIG ON 022215

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RICHARD V NOTARO, JR (SUBSTITUTE) AT 012215

02/10/2015:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RICHARD V NOTARO, JR (SUBSTITUTE) AT 012215

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

01/02/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

01/02/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD V NOTARO JR

01/02/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD V NOTARO JR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRIS N NOTARO

01/02/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRIS N NOTARO

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (BLANK)

01/01/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 1 (BLANK)

01/01/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 1 (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD V NOTARO JR (BLANK)

01/01/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD V NOTARO JR (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRIS N NOTARO (BLANK)

01/01/2015:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRIS N NOTARO (BLANK)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS *

01/01/2015:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS *

CERTIFICATION

01/01/2015:CERTIFICATION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS RNEUMAN@GIBBLAW.COM

01/01/2015:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS RNEUMAN@GIBBLAW.COM

COVER SHEET

01/01/2015:COVER SHEET

REAL PROPERTY VALUE CLAIM FORM $92,237.89

01/01/2015:REAL PROPERTY VALUE CLAIM FORM $92,237.89

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM -DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS WITHOUT PREJUDICE *

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON KRIS N. NOTARO FKA KRIS N. LUDWIG ON 022215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RICHARD V NOTARO, JR (SUBSTITUTE) AT 012215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD V NOTARO JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRIS N NOTARO (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS *

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS RNEUMAN@GIBBLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREAL PROPERTY VALUE CLAIM FORM $92,237.89

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $954.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2015
  • DocketCase 272015CA000014CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/1/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neuman, Rod B