Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 19:32:14 (UTC).

REDA, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 REDA, ROBERT was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REDA, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • ORDER FILED SETTING HEARING ON 5/6/19 AT 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • APPLICANT WAIVER AGREEMENT AND STATEMENT / PRIVACY ACT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DRIVERS LICENSE COPY - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • BIRTH CERTIFICATE COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO GEN MAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 615906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019DR000542DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Compliance MISC has been created with due date of 3/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less