Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/17/2019 at 13:16:35 (UTC).

REANI, BERNARDINO VS KREIDER, DILLON

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 REANI, BERNARDINO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KREIDER, DILLON. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REANI, BERNARDINO

Defendant

KREIDER, DILLON

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION - FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 031819

03/18/2019:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION - FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 031819

DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE - DTD 031819

03/18/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE - DTD 031819

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED ON 3/20/19 AT 7:14 AM

03/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED ON 3/20/19 AT 7:14 AM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 031919

03/19/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 031919

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

03/06/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DILLON KREIDER ON 02/26/19

03/04/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DILLON KREIDER ON 02/26/19

RESPONSE TO EVICTION SUMMONS & ADDRESSING MONY CLAIM & REQUEST FOR HEARING REGARDING MONIES FILED BY DILLON KREIDER

03/04/2019:RESPONSE TO EVICTION SUMMONS & ADDRESSING MONY CLAIM & REQUEST FOR HEARING REGARDING MONIES FILED BY DILLON KREIDER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/27/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR DILLON KREIDER

02/22/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR DILLON KREIDER

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

02/22/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DILLON KREIDER (PL)

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DILLON KREIDER (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DILLON KREIDER ON 02/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO EVICTION SUMMONS & ADDRESSING MONY CLAIM & REQUEST FOR HEARING REGARDING MONIES FILED BY DILLON KREIDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR DILLON KREIDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 612161

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DILLON KREIDER (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case 272019CC000251CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less