This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 05/05/2021 at 16:20:56 (UTC).

RAMOS, CHRISTINE M VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 RAMOS, CHRISTINE M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS, CHRISTINE M

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE

Defendant Attorney

HARPER, SHAQUANA CHIMERE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

04/30/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

04/30/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SHAQUANA C. HARPER, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF THE DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIG OF EMAIL TampaHC@Progressive.com

04/30/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SHAQUANA C. HARPER, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF THE DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIG OF EMAIL TampaHC@Progressive.com

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -FILED BY, DEF PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

04/30/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -FILED BY, DEF PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

04/07/2021:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

04/07/2021:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

04/07/2021:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

MEMORANDUM

04/07/2021:MEMORANDUM

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

04/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO (BLANK)

04/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO (BLANK)

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

04/05/2021:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

04/05/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE) -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SHAQUANA C. HARPER, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF THE DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIG OF EMAIL TampaHC@Progressive.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -FILED BY, DEF PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $412.00 Receipt Number H 730788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $412.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $412.00 Balance Remaining $412.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000261CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARPER , SHAQUANA CHIMERE