This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:15:46 (UTC).

RAGLAND, JERRY J VS LEWIS, SHYENNE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 RAGLAND, JERRY J filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LEWIS, SHYENNE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAGLAND, JERRY J

Defendant

LEWIS, SHYENNE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AGAINST SHYENNE LEWIS

04/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AGAINST SHYENNE LEWIS

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION - GRANTED - DTD 04/08/19

04/09/2019:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION - GRANTED - DTD 04/08/19

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST SHYENNE LEWIS

04/03/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST SHYENNE LEWIS

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

04/03/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON SHYENNE LEWIS 032619

03/29/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON SHYENNE LEWIS 032619

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHYENNE LEWIS

03/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHYENNE LEWIS

DOCUMENTS FILED - BY JEFF KAY - NOTICE OF IMPROPER SERVICE

03/19/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - BY JEFF KAY - NOTICE OF IMPROPER SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/14/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

03/14/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHYENNE LEWIS

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHYENNE LEWIS

DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

03/14/2019:DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

03/14/2019:NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

PETITION FOR EVICTION AND ADDITIONAL CORRESPONDENCE

03/14/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION AND ADDITIONAL CORRESPONDENCE

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST SHYENNE LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON SHYENNE LEWIS 032619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHYENNE LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - BY JEFF KAY - NOTICE OF IMPROPER SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHYENNE LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION AND ADDITIONAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number H 616159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000372CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less