This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 21:06:09 (UTC).

RABE, KARIN, SELLERS, MICHAEL A Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 RABE, KARIN, SELLERS, MICHAEL A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

SELLERS, MICHAEL A

Not Classified By Court

RABE, KARIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LUTZ, ELIZABETH GRACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE TO CREDITORS 10/2/20 10/9/20 (HERNANDO SUN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCOPY/SEARCH REQUEST FORM COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $6.55 Receipt Number H 701907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $6.55 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $6.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH MICHAEL ALLEN SELLERS (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 092420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 092420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH MICHAEL ALLEN SELLERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001027CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF MICHAEL SELLERS (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001015CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less