This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 19:58:09 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS WILLIAMS, CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

WILLIAMS, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CHRISTINA WILLIAMS

02/19/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CHRISTINA WILLIAMS

ORDER FILED GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - FOR PRETRL CONFERENCE SET ON 032119 AT 10:30AM - DTD 021919

02/19/2019:ORDER FILED GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - FOR PRETRL CONFERENCE SET ON 032119 AT 10:30AM - DTD 021919

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: CHRISTINA WILLIAMS - PT 032119 AT 10:30AM IN CRTROOM C

01/29/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: CHRISTINA WILLIAMS - PT 032119 AT 10:30AM IN CRTROOM C

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

01/22/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

01/22/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

01/22/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA WILLIAMS (BLANK)

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA WILLIAMS (BLANK)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1925.19

01/22/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1925.19

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CHRISTINA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FILED GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - FOR PRETRL CONFERENCE SET ON 032119 AT 10:30AM - DTD 021919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: CHRISTINA WILLIAMS - PT 032119 AT 10:30AM IN CRTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 607111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA WILLIAMS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1925.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case 272019SC000222SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less