Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/06/2021 at 13:25:22 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS REYES, NORMA

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REYES, NORMA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

REYES, NORMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO NORMA REYES (SUBST) ON 041321

04/14/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO NORMA REYES (SUBST) ON 041321

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NORMA REYES - PTC 060321 @ 12:15PM CRTRM C

04/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NORMA REYES - PTC 060321 @ 12:15PM CRTRM C

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $995.31

03/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $995.31

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/31/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS NORMA REYES - BLANK

03/31/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS NORMA REYES - BLANK

COVER SHEET

03/31/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO NORMA REYES (SUBST) ON 041321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NORMA REYES - PTC 060321 @ 12:15PM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 729439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS NORMA REYES - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $995.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000738SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ