This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/14/2019 at 18:18:25 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS MENGERSEN, KIMBERLY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MENGERSEN, KIMBERLY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

MENGERSEN, KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY MENGERSEN - PT 041719 AT 10:00AM IN CRTROOM B

02/22/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY MENGERSEN - PT 041719 AT 10:00AM IN CRTROOM B

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

02/19/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

SUMMONS ISSUED KIMBERLY MENGERSEN (BLANK)

02/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KIMBERLY MENGERSEN (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

02/19/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,074.67

02/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,074.67

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY MENGERSEN - PT 041719 AT 10:00AM IN CRTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 611658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED KIMBERLY MENGERSEN (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,074.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Case 272019SC000451SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less