This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/08/2022 at 18:19:04 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS MARTIN, NANCY L

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN, NANCY L. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

MARTIN, NANCY L

Weeki Wachee, FL 34613-4438

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/10/2022:COVER SHEET

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS NANCY L MARTIN -BLANK-

06/10/2022:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS NANCY L MARTIN -BLANK-

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

06/10/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NANCY L MARTIN - PTC 080122 AT 9:45 CRTRM C

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NANCY L MARTIN - PTC 080122 AT 9:45 CRTRM C

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,537.45

06/10/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,537.45

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON NANCY L MARTIN FOR PTC 080122 @945 CRTRM C 062022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NANCY L MARTIN - PTC 080122 AT 9:45 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 797378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS NANCY L MARTIN -BLANK-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,537.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase 272022SC001270SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ