This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/18/2019 at 18:20:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS LOPEZ, RAUL F

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOPEZ, RAUL F. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

LOPEZ, RAUL F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON RAUL LOPEZ (SUBST SERVED TO JANE DOE) 030919

03/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON RAUL LOPEZ (SUBST SERVED TO JANE DOE) 030919

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RAUL LOPEZ - PTC 041219 AT 10:30 CRTRM C

03/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RAUL LOPEZ - PTC 041219 AT 10:30 CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED RAUL LOPEZ (BLANK)

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RAUL LOPEZ (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

02/22/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $682.09

02/22/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $682.09

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON RAUL LOPEZ (SUBST SERVED TO JANE DOE) 030919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RAUL LOPEZ - PTC 041219 AT 10:30 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 612696

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED RAUL LOPEZ (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $682.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Case 272019SC000492SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less