This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 20:11:07 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS COLLINS, MATTHEW SEAN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COLLINS, MATTHEW SEAN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

COLLINS, MATTHEW SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW COLLINS - PTC 031419 AT 10:45 CRTRM B

02/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW COLLINS - PTC 031419 AT 10:45 CRTRM B

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

01/31/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

01/31/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

01/31/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW COLLINS (BLANK)

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW COLLINS (BLANK)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1166.07

01/31/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1166.07

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON COLLINS MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MATTHEW COLLINS - PTC 031419 AT 10:45 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 608673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW COLLINS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1166.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Case 272019SC000317SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less