Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/27/2019 at 19:25:33 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS CANNINO, CHRIS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CANNINO, CHRIS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

CANNINO, CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN, ARTHUR DREW

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANT

03/18/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANT

INTERROGATORY DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/18/2019:INTERROGATORY DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT FIRST REQUEST

03/18/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT FIRST REQUEST

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FIRST

03/18/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FIRST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEF/NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTY FEES/NOTICE THAT CLAIMS ARE DISPUTED/NOTICE PURSUANT TO SMALL CLAIMS RULE 7.090(D) - FILED BY ARTHUR DREW RUBIN, ATTY FOR DEF

03/18/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEF/NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTY FEES/NOTICE THAT CLAIMS ARE DISPUTED/NOTICE PURSUANT TO SMALL CLAIMS RULE 7.090(D) - FILED BY ARTHUR DREW RUBIN, ATTY FOR DEF

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON CHRIS CANNINO (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING JANE DOE, SPOUSE/CO-RESIDENT) AT 031219

03/13/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON CHRIS CANNINO (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING JANE DOE, SPOUSE/CO-RESIDENT) AT 031219

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRIS CANNINO - PTC 041719 AT 10:00 CRTRM B

03/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRIS CANNINO - PTC 041719 AT 10:00 CRTRM B

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

02/25/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS CANNINO (BLANK)

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS CANNINO (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

02/25/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,128.74

02/25/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,128.74

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INTERROGATORY DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT FIRST REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEF/NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTY FEES/NOTICE THAT CLAIMS ARE DISPUTED/NOTICE PURSUANT TO SMALL CLAIMS RULE 7.090(D) - FILED BY ARTHUR DREW RUBIN, ATTY FOR DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON CHRIS CANNINO (SUBSTITUTE, BY SERVING JANE DOE, SPOUSE/CO-RESIDENT) AT 031219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRIS CANNINO - PTC 041719 AT 10:00 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 613303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS CANNINO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,128.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Case 272019SC000540SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN ARTHUR D