This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 09/08/2022 at 13:24:07 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS AUGUSTINE, REJI

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against AUGUSTINE, REJI. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL, BARBARA-JO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL, BARBARA-JO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

AUGUSTINE, REJI

Spring Hill, FL 34609-2918

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA L.

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN, ARTHUR DREW

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/09/2022:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED REJI AUGUSTINE -BLANK-

08/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED REJI AUGUSTINE -BLANK-

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REJI AUGUSTINE

08/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REJI AUGUSTINE

COMPLAINT FILED

08/09/2022:COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

08/09/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEF ARTHUR DREW RUBIN

08/21/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEF ARTHUR DREW RUBIN

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON REJI AUGUSTINE 081922

08/22/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON REJI AUGUSTINE 081922

NOTICE OF - (DEFS) PENDING SETLMNT

08/23/2022:NOTICE OF - (DEFS) PENDING SETLMNT

STIPULATION FILED FOR PMT FILED BY PLNTF

08/25/2022:STIPULATION FILED FOR PMT FILED BY PLNTF

STIPULATION FILED FOR PMT FILED BY PLNTF

09/01/2022:STIPULATION FILED FOR PMT FILED BY PLNTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketJudge: BELL , BARBARA-JO Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketADM ORD-REASSIGN JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FILED FOR PMT FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FILED FOR PMT FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - (DEFS) PENDING SETLMNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON REJI AUGUSTINE 081922

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEF ARTHUR DREW RUBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REJI AUGUSTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED REJI AUGUSTINE -BLANK-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 806814

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CC000888CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN ARTHUR D