Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 21:21:59 (UTC).

PLEBAN, ALICE S, PLEBAN, DAVID Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 PLEBAN, ALICE S, PLEBAN, DAVID was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PLEBAN, DAVID

Decedent

PLEBAN, ALICE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

EVANS, KARA LYN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE TO CREDITORS 4/2/21 4/9/21 (LA GACETA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE DTD 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $3.00 Receipt Number H 728522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION WITH 2021-CP-357 (WFO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT FILED PAID FUNERAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $235.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000387CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ALICE SOPHIA PLEBAN (ORIG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ALICE S. PLEBAN (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000357CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS , KARA LYN