Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:34:27 (UTC).

PHIPPS, KRYSTAL VS BUZZONE, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 PHIPPS, KRYSTAL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BUZZONE, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHIPPS, KRYSTAL

Respondent

BUZZONE, CHRISTOPHER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD 3/17/21 CHRISTOPHER BUZZONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING FINAL HEARING FOR 4/7/21 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - ORDER CONTINUING AND TEMP INJ TO 040721@ 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO PUTNAM COUNTY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 4/7/2021 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO PUTNAM COUNTY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER - DOM VIOLENCE W/MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/10/2021 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000379DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less