This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/24/2019 at 13:15:55 (UTC).

PETERSON, STEVEN VS HICKS, ADAM

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 PETERSON, STEVEN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HICKS, ADAM. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERSON, STEVEN

Defendant

HICKS, ADAM

 

Court Documents

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO ADAM HICKS- CLERK CERTTIFICATE

05/29/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO ADAM HICKS- CLERK CERTTIFICATE

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO ADAM HICKS-ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT

05/28/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO ADAM HICKS-ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 051319

05/14/2019:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 051319

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINS DEFENDANT ADAM HICKS

05/09/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINS DEFENDANT ADAM HICKS

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

05/09/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/30/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ADAM HICKS

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ADAM HICKS

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/30/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

04/30/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION - COMPLAINT/3-DAY NOTICE

04/30/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION - COMPLAINT/3-DAY NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 051319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINS DEFENDANT ADAM HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO ADAM HICKS ON MAY 1, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ADAM HICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION - COMPLAINT/3-DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 623794

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case 272019CC000584CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less