This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 02:59:07 (UTC).

PAPE, LYNN A VS LUERAS, FELICITY R

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 PAPE, LYNN A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUERAS, FELICITY R. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAPE, LYNN A

Defendant

LUERAS, FELICITY R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/02/2021:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

07/02/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO FELICITY R LUERAS ~ BLANK

07/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO FELICITY R LUERAS ~ BLANK

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

07/08/2021:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

07/08/2021:HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FELICITY R LUERAS

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FELICITY R LUERAS

ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DTD 042921

07/08/2021:ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DTD 042921

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON FELICITY R LUERAS 072321

07/26/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON FELICITY R LUERAS 072321

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FELICITY R LUERAS

08/12/2021:ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FELICITY R LUERAS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS attorneys@woodlawpa.com FILED BY DEF

08/12/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS attorneys@woodlawpa.com FILED BY DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

08/12/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

08/12/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF FELICITY R LUERAS FILED BY PLNTF

08/12/2021:REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF FELICITY R LUERAS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

08/12/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

08/12/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

09/03/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

09/03/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF FELICITY R LUERAS FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS attorneys@woodlawpa.com FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY FELICITY R LUERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON FELICITY R LUERAS 072321

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FELICITY R LUERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 745039

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FELICITY R LUERAS ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DAMAGES FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000543CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE