This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/02/2021 at 05:08:26 (UTC).

PAPANTONIOU, ALISON KUHLMAN VS BLACKSTONE, LINDA

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 PAPANTONIOU, ALISON KUHLMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BLACKSTONE, LINDA. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAPANTONIOU, ALISON KUHLMAN

Defendant

BLACKSTONE, LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DYER, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

PIMENTA, JUSTIN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY COUNTER-DEF

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY COUNTER-DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF FILED BY PLNTF/COUNTER-DEF

10/21/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF FILED BY PLNTF/COUNTER-DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

10/21/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS -FILED BY DEF

10/15/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS -FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) -FILED BY DEF

10/13/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) -FILED BY DEF

REPLY or ANSWER TO DEF'S ANSWER AND AFFIRM DEFENSES DATED 101121 -FILED BY PLNTF/COUNTER-DEF, LINDA BLACKSTONE

10/13/2021:REPLY or ANSWER TO DEF'S ANSWER AND AFFIRM DEFENSES DATED 101121 -FILED BY PLNTF/COUNTER-DEF, LINDA BLACKSTONE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY ALISON PAPANTONIOU

10/11/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY ALISON PAPANTONIOU

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF PLNTF AND EMAIL DESIG fmiller@cagmil.com

10/08/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF PLNTF AND EMAIL DESIG fmiller@cagmil.com

AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN (AND RESPONSE) FILED BY PLNTF

10/07/2021:AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN (AND RESPONSE) FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

09/24/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF

09/24/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Service@uiterwyklaw.com FILED BY DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF

09/20/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Service@uiterwyklaw.com FILED BY DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OFJUSTIN W PIMENTA ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF

09/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OFJUSTIN W PIMENTA ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAM OF ALISON PAPANTONIOU W/ CRAIG BENNETT ME ON 112221 AT 3:30 AND DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS FILED BY DEF

09/20/2021:REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAM OF ALISON PAPANTONIOU W/ CRAIG BENNETT ME ON 112221 AT 3:30 AND DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

09/17/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF

09/17/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF

ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM FILED BY LINDA BLACKSTONE

09/17/2021:ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM FILED BY LINDA BLACKSTONE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ANDREW A GOODENOUGH AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG TAMPALEGAL@ALLSTATE.COM

09/17/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ANDREW A GOODENOUGH AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG TAMPALEGAL@ALLSTATE.COM

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY COUNTER-DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF/COUNTER-PLNTF FILED BY PLNTF/COUNTER-DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS -FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VERIFIED) -FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY or ANSWER TO DEF'S ANSWER AND AFFIRM DEFENSES DATED 101121 -FILED BY PLNTF/COUNTER-DEF, LINDA BLACKSTONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY ALISON PAPANTONIOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF PLNTF AND EMAIL DESIG fmiller@cagmil.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN (AND RESPONSE) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT LINDA BLACKSTONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FO RPRODUCE TO DEFENDANT LINDA BLACKSTONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LINDA BLACKSTONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO LINDA BLACKSTONE ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000630CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIMENTA, JUSTIN