Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:34:36 (UTC).

PAPANIKOLAOU TIANO, ALEXANDRA VS PAPANIKOLAOU, TASOS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 PAPANIKOLAOU TIANO, ALEXANDRA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PAPANIKOLAOU, TASOS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAPANIKOLAOU TIANO, ALEXANDRA

Respondent

PAPANIKOLAOU, TASOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING - TEMP. IJUNC. AGAINST DV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - PET. FTA CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON ORDER SERVED- SERVED ON 03/01/21 IN COLLIER COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCLERK CORRESPONDENCE VIA EMAIL TO COLLIER COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER - DOM VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS WAIVER OR NON WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/10/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000376DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less