Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:17:10 (UTC).

PALUMBO, PASQUALE VS CRUZ, CHRISTOPHER Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 PALUMBO, PASQUALE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CRUZ, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALUMBO, PASQUALE

Defendants

CRUZ, CHRISTOPHER

TORRES, KRYSTAL M

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 032819

03/28/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 032819

CLERK DEFAULT - EVICTION

03/26/2019:CLERK DEFAULT - EVICTION

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

03/26/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KRYSTAL M TORRES (SUBST SERVED TO JUSTINE TORRES) 031519

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KRYSTAL M TORRES (SUBST SERVED TO JUSTINE TORRES) 031519

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON CHRISTOPHER CRUZ 031519

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON CHRISTOPHER CRUZ 031519

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KRYSTAL M TORRES

03/14/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KRYSTAL M TORRES

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR CHRISTOPHER CRUZ

03/14/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR CHRISTOPHER CRUZ

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

03/14/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTOPHER CRUZ (PL)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTOPHER CRUZ (PL)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRYSTAL M TORRES (PL)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRYSTAL M TORRES (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 032819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK DEFAULT - EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KRYSTAL M TORRES (SUBST SERVED TO JUSTINE TORRES) 031519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON CHRISTOPHER CRUZ 031519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KRYSTAL M TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR CHRISTOPHER CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTOPHER CRUZ (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRYSTAL M TORRES (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 616150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000371CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less