Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 13:21:18 (UTC).

ORTIZ, LOURDES FERRAH VS DIGRIGOLI MAROULLETI, DOROTHY

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 ORTIZ, LOURDES FERRAH filed an Other lawsuit against DIGRIGOLI MAROULLETI, DOROTHY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ, LOURDES FERRAH

Defendant

DIGRIGOLI MAROULLETI, DOROTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, JAMES MARTIN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FROM DEFENDANT

05/24/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FROM DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF APRIL S. GOODWIN, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL FOR THE DEF, AND DESIG OF EMAIL april@goodwin-firm.com

05/03/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF APRIL S. GOODWIN, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL FOR THE DEF, AND DESIG OF EMAIL april@goodwin-firm.com

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETI ON 041221

04/13/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETI ON 041221

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETI

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETI

COMPLAINT FILED FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

03/31/2021:COMPLAINT FILED FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF - OF RELATED CASES

03/31/2021:NOTICE OF - OF RELATED CASES

SUMMONS ISSUED DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETTI - BLANK

03/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETTI - BLANK

COVER SHEET

03/31/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETI ON 041221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 729406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DOROTHY DIGRIGOLI-MAROULLETTI - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CC000393CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JAMES MARTIN