This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:18:25 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS RUIZ, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ, STEVEN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

RUIZ, STEVEN

Not Classified By Court

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

WILMINGTON TRUST NA

SPRINGLEAF FUNDING TRUST 2017-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON STEVEN RUIZ - PTC 111220 AT 9:15 CRTRM C

10/12/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON STEVEN RUIZ - PTC 111220 AT 9:15 CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STEVEN RUIZ - PTC 111220 AT 9:15 CRTR, C

10/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STEVEN RUIZ - PTC 111220 AT 9:15 CRTR, C

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,762.60

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,762.60

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS STEVEN RUIZ - BLANK

09/21/2020:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS STEVEN RUIZ - BLANK

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON STEVEN RUIZ - PTC 111220 AT 9:15 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STEVEN RUIZ - PTC 111220 AT 9:15 CRTR, C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 699656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS STEVEN RUIZ - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,762.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001921SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less