This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 18:26:15 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS MEDINA, EDGARDO J

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEDINA, EDGARDO J. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

MEDINA, EDGARDO J

Spring Hill, FL 34608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROLFE, AMANDA CLAY

SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/17/2022:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED EDGARDO J MEDINA -BLANK -

05/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED EDGARDO J MEDINA -BLANK -

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

05/17/2022:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: EDGARDO J MEDINA AKA EDGARDO MEDINA - PTC 072622 AT 10AM CRTRM C

05/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: EDGARDO J MEDINA AKA EDGARDO MEDINA - PTC 072622 AT 10AM CRTRM C

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY TO AMANDA C ROLFE ON BEHALF OF THE PLNTF EFF 052022

05/23/2022:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY TO AMANDA C ROLFE ON BEHALF OF THE PLNTF EFF 052022

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC 072622 FILED BY PLNTF

05/27/2022:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC 072622 FILED BY PLNTF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4194.36

05/17/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4194.36

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC 072622 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY TO AMANDA C ROLFE ON BEHALF OF THE PLNTF EFF 052022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: EDGARDO J MEDINA AKA EDGARDO MEDINA - PTC 072622 AT 10AM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EDGARDO J MEDINA -BLANK -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $4194.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 793315

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase 272022SC000999SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORDIAN, EMILY MCREE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROLFE, AMANDA CLAY