This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/11/2022 at 16:22:49 (UTC).

OBENSHAIN, JERRAD Et Al VS KB HOME Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 OBENSHAIN, JERRAD filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OBENSHAIN, JERRAD

OBENSHAIN, JESSICA

Defendants

KB HOME

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

KB HOME TAMPA LLC

Not Classified By Court

A&B STUCCO INC

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'BRIEN, NEIL PATRICK

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/12/2022:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC - BLANK -

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC - BLANK -

SUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME - BLANK -

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME - BLANK -

SUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME TAMPA, LLC - BLANK -

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME TAMPA, LLC - BLANK -

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KB HOME

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KB HOME

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KB HOME TAMPA, LLC

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KB HOME TAMPA, LLC

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON KB HOME FLORIDA LLC 051722

05/18/2022:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON KB HOME FLORIDA LLC 051722

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON BK HOME TAMPA LLC 051722

05/18/2022:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON BK HOME TAMPA LLC 051722

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KB HOME 051822

05/19/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KB HOME 051822

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/12/2022:COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR A&B STUCCO INC (BLANK)

06/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR A&B STUCCO INC (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC (BLANK)

06/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: A&B STUCCO INC

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: A&B STUCCO INC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: A&B STUCCO INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number H 795798

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR A&B STUCCO INC (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketANSWER & CROSSCLAIM FILED BY KB HOME TAMPA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KB HOME 051822

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME TAMPA, LLC - BLANK -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME - BLANK -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC - BLANK -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 792554

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CA000451CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less