Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/25/2019 at 13:18:39 (UTC).

MYERS, KELLY C VS CRAWFORD, SHAWN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 MYERS, KELLY C filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CRAWFORD, SHAWN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYERS, KELLY C

Defendants

CRAWFORD, SHAWN

GEISSER, KIMBERLY

 

Court Documents

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO SHAWN CRAWFORD - ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY

05/01/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO SHAWN CRAWFORD - ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 041119

04/12/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 041119

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER (PL)

04/12/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION TO SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER (PL)

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER

04/10/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT-AGAINST SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER

04/10/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT-AGAINST SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KIMBERLY GEISSER 040219

04/02/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KIMBERLY GEISSER 040219

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON SHAWN CRAWFORD (SUBST SERVED TO KIMBERLY GEISSER) 040219

04/02/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON SHAWN CRAWFORD (SUBST SERVED TO KIMBERLY GEISSER) 040219

APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

04/01/2019:APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/03/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

04/01/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT KIMBERLY GEISSER

04/01/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT KIMBERLY GEISSER

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR SHAWN CRAWFORD

04/01/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR SHAWN CRAWFORD

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE

04/01/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE

PLEASE DELETE THIS ENTRY

04/01/2019:PLEASE DELETE THIS ENTRY

PLEASE DELETE THIS ENTRY

04/01/2019:PLEASE DELETE THIS ENTRY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY GEISSER

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY GEISSER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHAWN CRAWFORD

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHAWN CRAWFORD

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 041119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION TO SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT-AGAINST SHAWN CRAWFORD AND KIMBERLY GEISSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON KIMBERLY GEISSER 040219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON SHAWN CRAWFORD (SUBST SERVED TO KIMBERLY GEISSER) 040219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLEASE DELETE THIS ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLEASE DELETE THIS ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIMBERLY GEISSER (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHAWN CRAWFORD (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 272019CC000458CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less