This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:16:46 (UTC).

MURNIGHAN, MARK VS CITIBANK NA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 MURNIGHAN, MARK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CITIBANK NA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURNIGHAN, MARK

Defendant

CITIBANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTAGLIUOLO, EUGENE P

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON CITIBANK ON 09282020

10/02/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON CITIBANK ON 09282020

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITIBANK NA - PTC 110520 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

09/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITIBANK NA - PTC 110520 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CITIBANK NA (BLANK)

09/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CITIBANK NA (BLANK)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,433.31

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,433.31

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF - PENDING SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ON CITIBANK ON 09282020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITIBANK NA - PTC 110520 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR CITIBANK NA (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 699665

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,433.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001922SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less