This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/26/2019 at 13:16:18 (UTC).

MOUSER, JEAN N Et Al VS DUMAS, PHILLIP JR

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 MOUSER, JEAN N filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DUMAS, PHILLIP JR. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOUSER, JEAN N

TIBBETTS LUMBER CO LLC DBA TIB

Defendant

DUMAS, PHILLIP JR

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INCORPORATED AND PHILLIP DUMAS JR

07/17/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INCORPORATED AND PHILLIP DUMAS JR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INC C/O PHILLIP DUMAS JR

04/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INC C/O PHILLIP DUMAS JR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PHILLIP DUMAS JR

04/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PHILLIP DUMAS JR

SUMMONS ISSUED PHILLIP DUMAS JR (BLANK)

04/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PHILLIP DUMAS JR (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INC C/O PHILLIP DUMAS JR (BLANK)

04/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INC C/O PHILLIP DUMAS JR (BLANK)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

04/03/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

EXHIBITS - CREDIT APPLICATION

04/03/2019:EXHIBITS - CREDIT APPLICATION

COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

04/03/2019:COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

COVER SHEET

04/03/2019:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INC C/O PHILLIP DUMAS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PHILLIP DUMAS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Payment received: $325.00 Receipt Number H 619967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $325.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED PHILLIP DUMAS JR (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TITAN CUSTOM BUILDERS INC C/O PHILLIP DUMAS JR (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS - CREDIT APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $325.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Case 272019CC000495CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDEPENDENT BANK is a litigant