Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 18:16:50 (UTC).

MORALES, WILLIAM VS SYNCHRONY BANK

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 MORALES, WILLIAM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SYNCHRONY BANK. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and KURT HITZEMANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

KURT HITZEMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES, WILLIAM

Defendant

SYNCHRONY BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK, RICHARD KING

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLNTFS STATEMENT OF CLAIM (SYNCHRONY BANK'S)

06/03/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLNTFS STATEMENT OF CLAIM (SYNCHRONY BANK'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARIAN KENNADY AS COUNSEL FOR DEF

04/04/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MARIAN KENNADY AS COUNSEL FOR DEF

COURT WORKSHEET - SGREED ORDER-PRETRIAL WAIVED

05/21/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - SGREED ORDER-PRETRIAL WAIVED

JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING PRETRL AND GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/13/2019:JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING PRETRL AND GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

AGREED ORDER WAIVING PRETRL AND GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - THE PRETRL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 052119 AT 9:30AM IS HEREBY CANCELLED AND THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM ATTENDING - DTD 051319

05/14/2019:AGREED ORDER WAIVING PRETRL AND GRANTING PLNTFS MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - THE PRETRL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 052119 AT 9:30AM IS HEREBY CANCELLED AND THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM ATTENDING - DTD 051319

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/02/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FI;ED BY PLNTF

06/20/2019:MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FI;ED BY PLNTF

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON SYNCHRONY BANK C/O PRESIDENT, VICE PRESIDENT, BRANCH MANAGER OR OTHER PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AT 032519

03/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON SYNCHRONY BANK C/O PRESIDENT, VICE PRESIDENT, BRANCH MANAGER OR OTHER PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AT 032519

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK - PTC 052119 AT 9:30 CRTRM B

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK - PTC 052119 AT 9:30 CRTRM B

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - APPROVED

03/20/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - APPROVED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (BLANK)

03/14/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (BLANK)

DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

03/14/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

DOCUMENTS FILED - STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/14/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

SUMMONS ISSUED SYNCHRONY BANK (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SYNCHRONY BANK (BLANK)

MOTION FILED TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT

03/14/2019:MOTION FILED TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT

MOTION FILED TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/14/2019:MOTION FILED TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON SYNCHRONY BANK C/O PRESIDENT, VICE PRESIDENT, BRANCH MANAGER OR OTHER PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AT 032519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK - PTC 052119 AT 9:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 5/21/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KURT HITZEMANN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED SYNCHRONY BANK (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FILED TO PERMIT DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FILED TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019SC000661SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Event Date: 05/21/2019 09:30; Judge: HITZEMANN, KURT; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK RICHARD K