Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 21:01:54 (UTC).

MONEYHAN, AARON, MONEYHAN, GLEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 MONEYHAN, AARON, MONEYHAN, GLEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

MONEYHAN, GLEN

Not Classified By Court

MONEYHAN, AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DAY, DAVID JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF GLEN E. MONEYHAN ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 728949

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPET TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH GLEN E MONEYHAN (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000448CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, DAVID JEFFREY