This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/20/2019 at 13:16:13 (UTC).

MINTON, ILA THOMAS VS KRASSNOSKI, REBECCA

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 MINTON, ILA THOMAS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KRASSNOSKI, REBECCA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MINTON, ILA THOMAS

Defendant

KRASSNOSKI, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

08/01/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

COURT WORKSHEET - WRIT OF POSSESSION GRANTED & RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

08/01/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - WRIT OF POSSESSION GRANTED & RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED ON DEPUTY J. MCDOUGAL - REFUSED PER CINDY YOST

09/04/2019:SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED ON DEPUTY J. MCDOUGAL - REFUSED PER CINDY YOST

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED ON REBECCA KRASSNOSKI ON 080219

08/08/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED ON REBECCA KRASSNOSKI ON 080219

SUBPOENA FOR HEARING - COUNTY - DEPUTY J MCDOUGAL

08/30/2019:SUBPOENA FOR HEARING - COUNTY - DEPUTY J MCDOUGAL

JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES AND/OR PAST DUE RENT - PLNTF AND DEF SHALL NOT RECOVER ANY DAMAGES, NOR COSTS DTD 090519

09/05/2019:JUDGMENT FOR DAMAGES AND/OR PAST DUE RENT - PLNTF AND DEF SHALL NOT RECOVER ANY DAMAGES, NOR COSTS DTD 090519

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT BY ILA THOMAS MINTON

06/10/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT BY ILA THOMAS MINTON

NOTICE OF EVICTION HEARING - ON 080119 AT 10:00AM IN CRTROOM C

06/17/2019:NOTICE OF EVICTION HEARING - ON 080119 AT 10:00AM IN CRTROOM C

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO REBECCA KRASSNOSKI ON 05/31/2019 (POSTED)

06/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO REBECCA KRASSNOSKI ON 05/31/2019 (POSTED)

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT, REBECCA KRASSNOSKI

06/07/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT, REBECCA KRASSNOSKI

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/29/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVCTION WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED DTD 080119

08/01/2019:JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVCTION WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED DTD 080119

PL'S RESPONSE TO DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

05/07/2019:PL'S RESPONSE TO DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

05/06/2019:MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON REBECCA KRASSNOSKI 042919

05/01/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON REBECCA KRASSNOSKI 042919

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/26/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

04/26/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/26/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS REGARDING CASE FILED BY REBECCA KRASSNOSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE TO PAY MONTHLY RENTAL RATE OF $150.00 INTO REGISTRY - PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE PROPER NOTICE TO DEFENDANT IN SAME CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 051619 @ 11:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PL'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PL'S RESPONSE TO DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Payment received: $154.50 Receipt Number H 624825

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $154.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $154.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON REBECCA KRASSNOSKI 042919

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 623158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REBECCA KRASSNOSKI (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Case 272019CC000556CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less