Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 18:15:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS WALTERS, CIJI PAULINE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALTERS, CIJI PAULINE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WALTERS, CIJI PAULINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHATANI, PAYAL YASHWANT

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CIJI WALTERS

04/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CIJI WALTERS

COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

05/01/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

04/29/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CIJI WALTERS - PTC 050119 AT 10:00 CRTRM C

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CIJI WALTERS - PTC 050119 AT 10:00 CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED CIJI WALTERS (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CIJI WALTERS (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1341.45

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1341.45

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CIJI WALTERS - PTC 050119 AT 10:00 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 616993

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED CIJI WALTERS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1341.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019SC000658SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHATANI , PAYAL