Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 18:16:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HELTON, NADIA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HELTON, NADIA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HELTON, NADIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3269.34

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3269.34

SUMMONS ISSUED NADIA HELTON (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED NADIA HELTON (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON NADIA HELTON (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032719

04/01/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON NADIA HELTON (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032719

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NADIA HELTON - PTC 052019 AT 10:00 CRTRM B

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NADIA HELTON - PTC 052019 AT 10:00 CRTRM B

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON NADIA HELTON (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NADIA HELTON - PTC 052019 AT 10:00 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 617002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED NADIA HELTON (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3269.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019SC000659SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less