This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 20:03:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS FEHRENBACH, JEAN A

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FEHRENBACH, JEAN A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

FEHRENBACH, JEAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: JEAN FEHRENBACH - PT 031319 AT 10:15AM IN CRTROOM B

01/30/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: JEAN FEHRENBACH - PT 031319 AT 10:15AM IN CRTROOM B

SUMMONS ISSUED JEAN FEHRENBACH (BLANK)

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JEAN FEHRENBACH (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

01/24/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4428.28

01/24/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4428.28

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETED NOT SERVED ON JEAN FEHRENBACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: JEAN FEHRENBACH - PT 031319 AT 10:15AM IN CRTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 607464

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JEAN FEHRENBACH (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $4428.28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Case 272019SC000255SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less