This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/01/2019 at 18:17:17 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS COATES, KRISTEN

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COATES, KRISTEN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

COATES, KRISTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRISTEN COATES - PTC 071719 AT 10:15 CRTRM B

05/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRISTEN COATES - PTC 071719 AT 10:15 CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED KRISTEN COATES *BLANK*

05/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KRISTEN COATES *BLANK*

COVER SHEET

05/08/2019:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,739.31

05/08/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,739.31

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KRISTEN COATES - PTC 071719 AT 10:15 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 625446

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED KRISTEN COATES *BLANK*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,739.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Case 272019SC001101SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less