Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 18:19:09 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS ROWTIE, RAMA R

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROWTIE, RAMA R. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

ROWTIE, RAMA R

Spring Hill, FL 34609-0671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $1777.97

03/01/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $1777.97

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO RAMA R ROWTIE (BLANK)

03/01/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO RAMA R ROWTIE (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/01/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ROMA R ROWTIE @031221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RAMA R ROWTIE - PTC 041521 11:00AM CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 723659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO RAMA R ROWTIE (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $1777.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000492SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN